IL SB2236 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Sponsor Removed Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Invest in Kids Act. Provides that no credits may be awarded under the Act for any taxable year that begins in a State fiscal year for which the minimum statutory funding level is not met. Provides that the carry-forward period for those credits shall be suspended for any taxable year that begins in a State fiscal year for which the minimum statutory funding level is not met. Requires the State Board of Education to determine whether or not the State has met the minimum funding level for the fiscal year and to transmit a copy of the determination to the Department of Revenue. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INVEST IN KIDS-FUNDING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-03-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 21, 2018
2018-02-20SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-01-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 30, 2018
2018-01-30SenateDo Pass Education; 009-004-000
2018-01-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Education
2017-10-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-10-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-10-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-10-18SenateFirst Reading
2017-10-18SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
354070New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback