IL SB2235 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Toll Highway Act. Makes changes concerning the privacy policy of the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority regarding the release of personally identifiable information in response to a subpoena in a pending civil action or lawful order from a civil court of competent jurisdiction. Provides that the Authority may release personally identifiable information to a grand jury if exigent circumstances make obtaining a warrant or subpoena impractical (instead of "in the case of an emergency when obtaining a warrant or subpoena would be impractical"). Provides that the Authority may release personally identifiable information to the Executive Inspector General. Provides that the Authority shall make personally identifiable information of a person available to any State or local agency, inspector general, or law enforcement agency in response to a grand jury subpoena or pursuant to an investigation. Provides that the Authority shall discard personally identifiable information within 5 years. Provides that the Authority shall make every effort, within practical business and cost constraints, to purge the personal account information of an account that is closed or terminated. Provides that in no case shall the Authority maintain personal information more than 5 years after the date an account is closed or terminated. Provides that the new provisions do not preclude compliance with a court order or settlement agreement that has been approved on or before January 1, 2022. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TOLL HWY-PERSONAL INFORMATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-16SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 28, 2021
2021-05-27SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2021-05-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
2021-05-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-05-27HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
2021-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2021-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-13HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
2021-05-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2021-05-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-05-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2021-04-26HouseArrived in House
2021-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
2021-04-14SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
2021-03-23SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6051019.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback