IL SB2233 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes capital appropriations to the Department of Natural Resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$DNR-CAPITAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Appropriations II
2017-10-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-10-18SenateFirst Reading
2017-10-18SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback