IL SB2232 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Emergency Management Agency Act. Provides that harm or potential harm to the residents of a long term care facility constitutes a disaster under the Act. Provides that the Governor's comprehensive plan and program for emergency management of the State and emergency operations plans shall include provisions concerning identifying necessary resources to allow a resident of a long term care facility to remain in his or her long term care facility, prioritizing restoration of power or securing alternative power sources, and identifying alternative facilities and emergency transportation for the evacuation of a long term care facility. Provides that the Illinois Emergency Management Agency shall establish a protocol for canvassing long term care facilities in a disaster area to determine what resources are needed to permit the residents to remain in place, the need for evacuation assistance, or the status of power at long term care facilities. Makes additional changes to provisions concerning the Illinois Emergency Management Agency, emergency powers of the Governor, mobile support teams, and private liability. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission, in collaboration with the Illinois Emergency Management Agency, shall establish by rule a priority order for the restoration of power or securing alternative power sources and shall place long term care facilities licensed under the Nursing Home Care Act in the top tier of priority with other residential health care facilities. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IEMA-LONG TERM CARE FACILITIES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Koehler
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-000-000
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2018-04-19SenateFiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-04-18SenateFiscal Note Requested by Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Public Health; 007-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Public Health
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Public Health
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-10-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-10-18SenateFirst Reading
2017-10-18SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20330510Amended CodeCitation Text
20330518Amended CodeCitation Text
2033052Amended CodeCitation Text
20330521Amended CodeCitation Text
2033054Amended CodeCitation Text
2033055Amended CodeCitation Text
2033056Amended CodeCitation Text
2033057Amended CodeCitation Text
2033058Amended CodeCitation Text
22052-202.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback