IL SB2229 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a provision prohibiting the sale, manufacture, purchase, possession, or carrying of any knife, commonly referred to as a switchblade, which has a blade that opens automatically by hand pressure applied to a button, spring, or other device in the handle of the knife, does not apply to a person who is 18 years of age or older (currently, a person who possesses a currently valid Firearm Owner's Identification Card previously issued in his or her name by the Department of State Police). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-SWITCHBLADES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-09-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-09-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-09-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720524-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback