IL SB2227 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations II
Pending: Senate Appropriations II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes Fiscal Year 2018 capital appropriations to the Capital Development Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$CAPITAL DEVELOPMENT BOARD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations II
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Appropriations II
2017-09-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-09-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-09-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback