IL SB2226 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0648
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0648
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Police Act. Provides that a physician, physician's assistant with prescriptive authority, or advanced practice registered nurse with prescriptive authority who provides a standing order or prescription for epinephrine auto-injectors in the name of the Department of State Police shall incur no civil or professional liability, except for willful and wanton conduct, as a result of any injury or death arising from the use of an epinephrine auto-injector. Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that a physician, physician's assistant with prescriptive authority, or advanced practice registered nurse with prescriptive authority who provides a standing order or prescription for epinephrine auto-injectors in the name of a local governmental agency shall incur no civil or professional liability, except for willful and wanton conduct, as a result of any injury or death arising from the use of an epinephrine auto-injector. Makes conforming changes to the Medical Practice Act of 1987 and the Public Health Standing Orders Act. Effective immediately.
Title
EPINEPHRINE LIABILITY-POLICE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0648 |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Effective Date July 31, 2018 |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-05-16 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-02-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 21, 2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-08-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-08-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-08-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2610 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 65 | New Code | See Bill Text |
410 | 125 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 705 | 10.19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |