IL SB2226 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Police Act. Provides that a physician, physician's assistant with prescriptive authority, or advanced practice registered nurse with prescriptive authority who provides a standing order or prescription for epinephrine auto-injectors in the name of the Department of State Police shall incur no civil or professional liability, except for willful and wanton conduct, as a result of any injury or death arising from the use of an epinephrine auto-injector. Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that a physician, physician's assistant with prescriptive authority, or advanced practice registered nurse with prescriptive authority who provides a standing order or prescription for epinephrine auto-injectors in the name of a local governmental agency shall incur no civil or professional liability, except for willful and wanton conduct, as a result of any injury or death arising from the use of an epinephrine auto-injector. Makes conforming changes to the Medical Practice Act of 1987 and the Public Health Standing Orders Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPINEPHRINE LIABILITY-POLICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-05-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000
2018-05-16HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-05-16HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2018-05-09HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-21HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-02-21HouseArrived in House
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-02-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 21, 2018
2018-02-20SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-02-07SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-000-000
2018-02-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-02-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-02-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-02-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-01-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-01-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-01-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-08-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-08-17SenateFirst Reading
2017-08-17SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20261040Amended CodeCitation Text
2256065New CodeSee Bill Text
41012530New CodeSee Bill Text
5070510.19Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback