IL SB2225 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides for the issuance of Operation Desert Shield/Desert Storm license plates to any Illinois resident who has earned the Southwest Asia Service Medal from the United States Armed Forces. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-DESERT STORM PLATES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-22SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Transportation; 011-000-000
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-07-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-07-31SenateFirst Reading
2017-07-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-699.15New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback