IL SB2223 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0784
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that a political committee that receives notification from the State Board of Elections to conduct an audit of its financial records must conduct that audit using the financial records required to be maintained by the committee for a period of 2 years from the close of the most recent reporting period (rather than for a period of 2 years). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-AUDIT TIMELINE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-10SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0784
2018-08-10SenateEffective Date August 10, 2018
2018-08-10SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-15SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-17SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-17HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2018-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2018-04-11HouseArrived in House
2018-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018
2018-02-22SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-07-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-07-03SenateFirst Reading
2017-07-03SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1059-13Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback