IL SB2222 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $53,817,000 to the Illinois Emergency Management Agency from the Homeland Security Emergency Preparedness Trust Fund for terrorism preparedness and training costs in the current and prior years. Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
$IEMA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations I |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-07-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2222&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/PDF/10000SB2222.pdf |