IL SB2219 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that it is unlawful for any individual who is engaged in the business of providing legal representation in real estate tax assessment appeals to make campaign contributions of more than $750, in the aggregate, to any political committee established to promote the candidacy of a candidate for township or multi-township assessor, county assessor, county supervisor of assessments, or member of the board of review in any jurisdiction where that individual provides such legal representation. Provides that it is unlawful for any candidate, political committee, or other person to knowingly accept or receive such a contribution. Amends the Property Tax Code. Requires assessment officials to transmit to the chief county assessment officer valuation models for the assessor's jurisdiction, and requires the chief county assessment officer to post that information on his or her Internet website. Makes changes to the definition of "fair cash value". Makes changes concerning sales ratio studies. Requires the Department of Revenue to conduct audits of assessment practices. Provides that, if the county or township is deemed to be persistently non-compliant with the audit, then the assessment official shall be removed from office, and the vacancy shall be filled by the county board.
Title
PROP TX-ASSESSMENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-06-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 9-50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 1-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 17-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 4-35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 8-11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2219&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2219.htm |