IL SB2211 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fire Sprinkler Contractor Licensing Act. Provides that an individual who performs inspection and testing of fire sprinkler systems and control equipment must possess on his or her person a photo identification card issued by the State Fire Marshal as proof of compliance with the Act. Provides that the photo identification card shall be issued by the State Fire Marshal annually at a fee determined by the State Fire Marshal by rule. Provides that all inspections and testing of fire sprinkler systems and control equipment must be recorded on an inspection report issued by the State Fire Marshal and provides requirements for the inspection reports. Provides that all fire sprinkler systems must be affixed with a pre-printed label bearing specified information that shall be purchased by the licensed contractor from the State Fire Marshal. Provides that a copy of the inspection report must be forwarded to the State Fire Marshal within 24 hours after completion of the inspection. Provides that the fees for an inspection form and photo identification card shall be determined by the State Fire Marshal by rule. Provides that the State Fire Marshal has the power and duty to establish a database of all persons involved in the inspection or testing of existing fire sprinkler systems or control equipment.
Title
FIRE SPRINKLER - DATABASE
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 317 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 317 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 317 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2211&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2211.htm |