IL SB2210 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Mass Transportation Safety Act. Provides that a mass transportation carrier shall provide to a person operating a commercial motor vehicle for the purpose of providing mass transportation a rest period of not less than 10 minutes for every segment of 4 hours, or major part thereof, to use the nearest convenient restroom without deduction from the employee's pay. Provides that the Act does not prohibit employers and employees from establishing, under a collective bargaining agreement, appropriate rest periods different from those provided in the Act. Defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MASS TRANSPORTATION SAFETY ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-04-17SenateDo Pass Transportation; 013-000-000
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Transportation
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-05-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-15SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback