IL SB2207 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that municipalities with a population of greater than 1,000,000 shall require their police officers to wear and use body cameras and to create policies concerning the wearing and use of body cameras on or before January 1, 2017. Limits home rule powers. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD-POLICE BODY CAMERAS
Sponsors
Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2016-03-02 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Police Professionalism |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2015-12-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-12-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-12-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2207&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2207.htm |