IL SB2202 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit for a taxpayer who purchases a manufactured home during the taxable year if: (i) the purchase is the first purchase of the manufactured home for use as a dwelling; and (ii) the taxpayer certifies that, within 30 days after the retail sale, the manufactured home will be affixed to a permanent foundation in the State so that the manufactured home is deemed to be real property. Provides that the credit shall be 50% of the purchase price of the manufactured home. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TAX-MANUFACTURED HOME CRED
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |