IL SB2200 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Provides that if a unit of local government, as an employer, and public employees provide for arbitration of impasses, the employer's financial ability to fund the proposals based on existing available resources shall be given primary consideration, provided that such ability is not predicated on an assumption that lines of credit or reserve funds are available or that the employer may or will receive or develop new sources of revenue or increase existing sources of revenue. Provides that in interest arbitration for security employee, peace officer, and fire fighter disputes, the arbitration panel shall take the employer's financial ability to fund the proposals based on existing available resources as the primary consideration, provided that such ability is not predicated on an assumption that lines of credit or reserve funds are available or that the employer may or will receive or develop new sources of revenue or increase existing sources of revenue (currently the interests and welfare of the public and the financial ability of the unit of government to meet those goals). Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. With respect to collective bargaining between an educational employer (other than the Chicago school district) and an exclusive representative of its employees, provides that when making wage and benefit determinations during interest arbitration, the employer's financial ability to fund the proposals based on existing available resources shall be given primary consideration, provided that such ability is not predicated on an assumption that lines of credit or reserve funds are available or that the employer may or will receive or develop new sources of revenue or increase existing sources of revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LABOR REL-FINANCIAL ABILITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-05-02SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 12, 2017
2017-04-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-27SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-27SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
115512Amended CodeCitation Text
531514Amended CodeCitation Text
53157Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback