IL SB2194 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employee, State Universities, Downstate Teacher, and Chicago Teacher Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires active Tier 1 employees to elect either to (i) have automatic annual increases in retirement and survivor's annuities delayed and reduced or (ii) maintain their current benefit package with additional limitations on pensionable salary. Provides that a Tier 1 employee who elects item (i) is entitled to have future increases in income treated as pensionable income, have contributions reduced to a specified rate, and receive a consideration payment of 10% of contributions made prior to the election. Provides that a Tier 1 employee who elects item (ii) is not eligible to have future increases in income treated as pensionable income. Makes funding changes. Amends the State Pension Funds Continuing Appropriation Act to provide a continuing appropriation for the amounts of the consideration payments. Amends various Acts to make conforming changes. Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act and the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act to prohibit bargaining and interest arbitration regarding certain changes made by the amendatory Act and to provide that no action of the employer taken to implement that prohibition shall give rise to an unfair labor practice under those Acts; exempts certain existing agreements. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Sen. Tom Rooney [R] | Sen. Kyle McCarter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (LA) |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-11 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (LA) |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 12, 2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 24-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 24-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.53 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 305 | 100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 520 | 85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 660 | 5-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 665 | 10-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 670 | 15-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 675 | 20-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 680 | 25-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 685 | 30-205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 690 | 35-200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 70 | 36d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 3-26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 3-42 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
115 | 5 | 10.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
115 | 5 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
115 | 5 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
115 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 205 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 310 | 13a | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 410 | 13a | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 510 | 12a | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 5 | 5-647 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 805 | 8.41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 15 | 1.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 14-103.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-103.41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 14-103.42 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 14-103.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 14-106.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 14-114 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-131 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-133 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-135.08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-152.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-108.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-112.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 15-112.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 15-132.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 15-136 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-157 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-165 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-198 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-107.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 16-121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-121.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 16-121.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 16-122.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 16-133.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-136.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-158 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-106.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 17-113.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 17-113.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 17-113.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 17-115.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 17-116 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-119.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 17-129 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 315 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 315 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 315 | 7.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2194&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2194.htm |