IL SB2193 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0546
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0546
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person commits burglary when without authority he or she knowingly enters or without authority remains within a freight container with intent to commit therein a felony or theft. Provides that burglary committed in, and without causing damage to a freight container or any part thereof is a Class 3 felony. Provides that a burglary committed while causing damage to a freight container or any part thereof is a Class 2 felony.
Title
FREIGHT CONTAINER BURGLARY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0546 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-001 |
2021-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2021-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2021-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2021-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2021-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2021-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 19-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |