IL SB2193 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Restricts participation in the General Assembly Retirement System to persons who became participants before the effective date of the amendatory Act. Beginning in fiscal year 2018, makes funding changes. Requires the Board to recalculate and recertify the amount of the State's required contribution for fiscal year 2018. Establishes a voluntary defined contribution plan for certain Tier 1 members and makes conforming changes in the Retirement Systems Reciprocal Act (Article 20 of the Code). Repeals provisions concerning a defined contribution plan added by Public Act 98-599, which has been held unconstitutional. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-GARS-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (LA) |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 12, 2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 2-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 2-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 2-105.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 2-107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 2-124 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 2-134 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 2-162 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 2-165 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 2-165.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 2-166 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 2-166.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 20-121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 20-123 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 20-124 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 20-125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2193&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2193.htm |