IL SB2193 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Assembly Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Restricts participation in the General Assembly Retirement System to persons who became participants before the effective date of the amendatory Act. Beginning in fiscal year 2018, makes funding changes. Requires the Board to recalculate and recertify the amount of the State's required contribution for fiscal year 2018. Establishes a voluntary defined contribution plan for certain Tier 1 members and makes conforming changes in the Retirement Systems Reciprocal Act (Article 20 of the Code). Repeals provisions concerning a defined contribution plan added by Public Act 98-599, which has been held unconstitutional. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-GARS-VARIOUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-19SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-11SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (LA)
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno
2017-05-03SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kyle McCarter
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-05-02SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 12, 2017
2017-04-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-27SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-27SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.41New CodeSee Bill Text
4052-101Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-105Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-105.3New CodeSee Bill Text
4052-107Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-124Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-134Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-162Amended CodeCitation Text
4052-165Repealed CodeCitation Text
4052-165.1New CodeSee Bill Text
4052-166Repealed CodeCitation Text
4052-166.1New CodeSee Bill Text
40520-121Amended CodeCitation Text
40520-123Amended CodeCitation Text
40520-124Amended CodeCitation Text
40520-125Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback