IL SB2190 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of the Code to the contrary, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services' Inspector General shall report all suspected cases of provider fraud involving a vendor, a medical provider, or any other provider authorized to participate in the medical assistance program to the State's Attorney of the county where the alleged fraud occurred or, when appropriate, to the Office of the Attorney General or to the Offices of the several United States Attorneys in Illinois. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-VENDOR FRAUD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-12SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (HS)
2017-05-09SenatePostponed - Human Services
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-05-02SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 12, 2017
2017-04-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2017-04-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-04-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-26SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305512-13.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback