IL SB2189 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Medicaid Smart Card Pilot Program Act. Requires the Director of the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to establish a Medicaid Smart Card Pilot Program to reduce the total amount of expenditures under the State's Medical Assistance Program. Provides that the pilot program shall be designed to reduce the average monthly cost under the State's Medical Assistance Program for recipients within the pilot program area by an amount that is at least sufficient to recover the cost of implementing the pilot program. Provides that the Director shall determine the geographic area to be included in the pilot program and may contract with an independent entity for the purpose of developing and implementing the pilot program. Contains provisions on required activities under the pilot program, including the distribution of Medicaid Smart Cards to designated recipients; measures the Department might take to implement the pilot program; annual evaluations; reporting requirements; extension or expansion of the pilot program; the confidentiality of health information; reports to the Inspector General; and rulemaking authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID SMART CARD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-12SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (HS)
2017-05-09SenatePostponed - Human Services
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-05-02SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 12, 2017
2017-04-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2017-04-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-04-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-26SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback