IL SB2186 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0890
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0890
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a school district is subject to and its school board must comply with any valid local government zoning ordinance or resolution that applies where the pertinent part of the school district is located. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-ZONING COMPLIANCE
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Rep. Michael Tryon [R] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Elaine Nekritz [D] |
Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] | Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0890 |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date August 25, 2016 |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2016-05-26 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-26 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2016-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 022-000-000 |
2016-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2016-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2016-05-13 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2016-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Althoff |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 18, 2016 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.13a | Amended Code | Citation Text |