IL SB2185 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Alcoholism and Other Drug Abuse and Dependency Act. Redefines "detoxification" as the process of allowing an individual to safely withdraw or sober from a drug or alcohol in a controlled environment, including a treatment or law enforcement facility (rather than the process of allowing an individual to safely withdraw from a drug in a controlled environment). Provides that if an individual under the age of 21 is arrested while under the influence of alcohol or drugs, the police officer on duty has a reasonable suspicion that the individual is still under the influence while at the police station, and there are signs that the individual is impaired, then the officer must make a reasonable attempt to contact a responsible adult who is willing to take custody of the intoxicated individual. Provides that if a responsible adult is not available or is unwilling to take custody of the individual, the individual shall be offered the opportunity to take a breathalyzer or chemical test to prove that he or she is sober; and that if the individual opts for one of the tests, the results of the test shall not be used in any criminal or civil prosecution against the individual. Exempts a police officer from civil or criminal liability for acting in good faith and without negligence in connection with certain actions, including the detention or discharge or the taking into protective custody of an individual under the Act. Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as Conor's Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-CONOR'S LAW

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-28SenateSent to the Governor
2017-06-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-06-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-06-29SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-06-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2017-06-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-06-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-06-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-06-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-06-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-06-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-06-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-06-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-06-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-06-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-06-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-06-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-06-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-06-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-06-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-06-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-05-25HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-05-25HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-25HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-05-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-05-24HouseArrived in House
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-002
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Manar
2017-05-24SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-001
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2017-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2017-05-04SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000
2017-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2017-04-25SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-04SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
203011-10Amended CodeCitation Text
2030125-15Amended CodeCitation Text
2030155-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback