IL SB2185 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-14 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-14 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the ordinary and contingent expenses of the Illinois Community College Board for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2015, as follows: Other State Funds $43,000,000Total$43,000,000
Title
$COMMUNITY COLLEGE BOARD
Sponsors
Sen. Pat McGuire [D] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] |
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2185&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/PDF/09900SB2185.pdf |