IL SB2176 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0038
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0038
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Uniform Electronic Transactions Act. Provides that a contract, record, or signature may not be denied legal effect or enforceability simply because it is in electronic form or an electronic record was used in its formation. Provides that if a law requires a record to be in writing, an electronic record satisfies the law. Provides that if a law requires a signature, an electronic signature satisfies the law. Repeals the Electronic Commerce Security Act. Makes corresponding changes in various laws to conform cross references. Effective immediately.
Title
UNIFORM ELECTRONIC TRANSACTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0038 |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Effective Date June 25, 2021 |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 111-000-001 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Sims |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115 | 5 | 11.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 405 | 14.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2310 | 2310-600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 35 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 10.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 143.34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 513a13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 57 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 175 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 315 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 70 | 1.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 55 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 17-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 35 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 35 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 40 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 43 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 43 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 45 | 4-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 45 | 4-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 180 | 1-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |