IL SB2173 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-25 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-25 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that an apprentice who is hired by the taxpayer through the United States Department of Defense SkillBridge internship program is considered a qualifying apprentice for the purpose of the apprenticeship education expense credit. Provides that, in the case of an employee participating in the SkillBridge program, the credit shall be equal to $3,500 per qualifying apprentice. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-APPRENTICESHIP CREDIT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-03-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2022-02-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Anderson |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2022 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 18, 2022 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Re-assigned to Revenue |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 231 | Amended Code | Citation Text |