IL SB2172 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0075
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0075
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that, in order to be considered a responsible bidder under the Code, a bidder must submit a signed affidavit stating that it will maintain an Illinois office as the primary place of employment for persons employed in the construction authorized by the contract. Effective immediately.
Title
PROCUREMENT-RESPONSIBLE BIDDER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 44 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0075 |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Effective Date June 30, 2011 |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 044-013-000 |
2011-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 044-013-000 |
2011-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2011-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2011-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2011-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2011-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-003-000 |
2011-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2011-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2011-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2011-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2011-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011 |
2011-05-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-05-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2011-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-021-000 |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2011 |
2011-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2011 |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 012-001-000 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 30-22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |