IL SB2160 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure and the Good Samaritan Act to reenact certain provisions of Public Act 94-677, which was declared to be unconstitutional by the Illinois Supreme Court in Lebron v. Gottlieb Memorial Hospital. Includes explanatory and validation provisions. Makes changes relating to the reenactment. Also makes these substantive changes: Amends the Code of Civil Procedure to lower the rate of interest payable on judgments and to delay the accrual of interest in certain cases where a federal Medicare lien may exist against the judgment. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REENACT 94-677 INSUR INTEREST

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-13SenateSession Sine Die
2013-03-22SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2013-03-13SenateTo Subcommittee on Tort Reform
2013-03-05SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2013-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2013-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2013-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73552-1303Amended CodeCitation Text
73552-1704.6New CodeSee Bill Text
73552-622Amended CodeCitation Text
73558-1901Amended CodeCitation Text
73558-2501Amended CodeCitation Text
7454930Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback