IL SB2156 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago School District Article of the School Code. Provides that students of the district shall take 4 standardized academic achievement tests per school year and must not be required to take more than that number. Provide that the 4 tests shall consist of 2 State tests and 2 tests to comply with the Evaluation of Employees Article of the Code. Effective July 1, 2013.
Title
SCH CD-CHI-STANDARD TEST LIMIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Re-assigned to Education |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2156&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2156.htm |