IL SB2153 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0641
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0641
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hospital Licensing Act. Requires a hospital to provide a plan of correction to the Department of Public Health within 60 days if the hospital demonstrates a pattern or practice of failing to substantially comply with specified requirements or with the hospital's written staffing plan. Allows the Department to impose specified fines on a hospital for failing to comply with written staffing plans for nursing services or plans of correction. Requires money from fines to be deposited into the Hospital Licensure Fund (instead of the Long Term Care Provider Fund). Contains provisions concerning staffing plans. Amends the Nursing Education Scholarship Law. Provides that the Department of Public Health may award a total of $500,000 annually in nursing education scholarships. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit for taxpayers who are employed during the taxable year as nurse educators. Provides that the credit shall be equal to 2.5% of the taxpayer's federal adjusted gross income for the taxable year. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-NURSE EDUCATORS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0641 |
2021-08-27 | Senate | Effective Date August 27, 2021 |
2021-08-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Health; 014-000-000 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Health |
2021-05-21 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Sue Rezin |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-001-000 |
2021-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-18 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2021-05-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-001 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass Health; 014-000-000 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported Back To Health; 005-000-000 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Public Health |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 975 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 85 | 10.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 85 | 14.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 85 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 232 | New Code | See Bill Text |