IL SB2148 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0577
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0577
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that the Law Enforcement Training Assistance Fund is created as a nonappropriated State trust fund within the State treasury. Provides that all gifts, donations, and charitable contributions that are contributed by any public or private individual or entity to the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board for the purpose of supporting local law enforcement training shall be deposited into this Fund. Amends the Law Enforcement Intern Training Act. Creates the Correctional Officer Intern Program. To be eligible to participate, the person must meet the minimum criteria established by the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board that includes, but is not limited to, physical fitness standards, educational standards, psychological standards, being at least 21 years of age, of good character, and not convicted of a felony offense or other crime involving moral turpitude under the laws of this State or any other State that, if convicted in this State, would be punishable as a felony or a crime of moral turpitude. Provides that the Board shall require correctional interns to undertake, at a minimum, the same training requirements as established for correctional officers. Provides that the Board certificate reserved for correctional officers shall not be awarded until the correctional intern is employed, has successfully completed the State certification exam, and meets the requirements. Makes other conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER INTERNS
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] | Rep. Monica Bristow [D] |
Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] | Rep. Nathan Reitz [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0577 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-003-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-05-14 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-04-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 705 | 10.23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 708 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 708 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 708 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 708 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 708 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 708 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 708 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |