IL SB2146 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0576
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to create a Clean Water Workforce Pipeline Program to provide grants and other financial assistance to individuals for careers in water infrastructure. Provides requirements for funding, grants, and other financial assistance from the Program on a competitive and annual basis for specified activities. Provides that the Program shall have an annual goal of training and placing 2,500 specified individuals in water sector jobs annually. Directs the Department to coordinate with the Environmental Protection Agency, Illinois Finance Authority, and other State agencies that provide financial support for water infrastructure projects in order to encourage the employment of individuals trained through the Program onto projects receiving State financial assistance. Provides that the Department may select a Program Administrator to oversee the allocation of funds and select organizations that receive funding. Requires recipients under the Program to report annually to the Department on the success of their efforts and their contribution to reaching the goals of the Program. Requires the Department to compile the information and report specified information to the General Assembly annually. Within 90 days after the amendatory Act's effective date, requires the Department to propose a draft plan to implement amendatory Act's provisions for public comment and to finalize the plan within 180 days after the amendatory Act's effective date. Grants rulemaking authority to the Department to implement the Program and ensure compliance with the amendatory Act's provisions. Provides that moneys in the Water Workforce Development Fund shall only be used to fund the Program and to assist and enable implementation of clean water infrastructure capital investments. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Water Workforce Development Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CLEAN WATER WORKFORCE PIPELINE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0576
2019-08-23SenateEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-23SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000
2019-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Commerce and Economic Development
2019-05-24SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-24SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2019
2019-05-23SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-011-000
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-07HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 020-006-000
2019-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Energy & Environment Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
2019-05-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Energy & Environment Committee
2019-04-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-001-000
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Villivalam
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 007-002-000
2019-04-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2019-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-03-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019
2019-03-21SenateDo Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 010-001-000
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-03-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-03-14SenatePostponed - Commerce and Economic Development
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20605913New CodeSee Bill Text
301055.891New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2146&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2146.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2146eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2146enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0576.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2146sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2146ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB2146_04102019_105000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB2146_05232019_072000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB2146ham001_05312019_055000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback