IL SB2142 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Legislative Youth Advisory Council Act. Provides that the purpose of the Council is to facilitate communication between the youth of the State of Illinois and the elected branches of State government regarding the issues, interests, and needs important to youth in the State of Illinois. Creates an Advisory Board, consisting of 2 members of the House of Representatives, one each appointed by the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the Minority Leader of the House of Representatives; and 2 members of the Senate, one each appointed by the President of the Senate and the Minority Leader of the Senate, to facilitate the functions of the Council. Provides for the application and nomination process for prospective members of the Council. Sets forth membership and meeting requirements and the powers of the Council. Provides that members of the Council shall serve one-year terms, but may be re-elected if they continue to be nominated and qualified to serve as members. Provides for the election of a President, Secretary, Treasurer, and Clerk at the first Council meeting of the year. Requires the Council to submit an annual report to the General Assembly and the Governor. Creates the Illinois Legislative Youth Advisory Council Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides that all moneys in the Fund shall be used to reimburse Council members for actual expenses incurred in traveling to Council meetings, including travel, food, and lodging, and printing the annual report. Amends the State Finance Act. Adds the Illinois Legislative Youth Advisory Council Fund. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

YOUTH ADVISORY COUNCIL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - State Government
2019-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass as Amended State Government; 009-000-000
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.891New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback