IL SB2136 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that the Illinois State Police and all law enforcement agencies within the State shall automatically expunge all criminal history records of a conviction for felony prostitution committed prior to the effective date of the amendatory Act. Establishes timelines for the automatic expungement of the records based on the date of the creation of the records. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that a petition for post-conviction relief may be filed by a person confined, or subject to being confined by the State, local, or federal government as a result of a State criminal conviction (rather than only by persons imprisoned in the penitentiary). Strikes a provision concerning expungement procedures for drug tests. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EXPUNGEMENT-PROSTITUTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 67 N: 38 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2021-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 009-006-000
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 009-006-000
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2021
2021-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2021-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-038-000
2021-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-05-30HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2021-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2021-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2021-05-29HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
2021-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-05-27HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2021-05-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-05-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-006-000
2021-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2021-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000
2021-05-12HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Chris Bos
2021-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-05-03HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-04-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2021-04-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2021-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2021-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-04-23HouseArrived in House
2021-04-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2021-04-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021
2021-04-21SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Collins
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-001-000
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2021-04-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-03-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
2021-03-24SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 007-002-000
2021-03-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2021-03-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-03-16SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026305.2Amended CodeCitation Text
7255122-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2136&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2136.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2136eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2136enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2136sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2136ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2136ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB2136_04222021_069000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB2136_05302021_036000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB2136ham002_05312021_014001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB2136ham001_05312021_014000C.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback