IL SB2134 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Adoption Act. Provides that a confidential intermediary shall be permitted to access records of closed child welfare agencies that are housed in the State Central Storage, if the petitioner is an adult adopted or surrendered person, or the adoptive parent of an adult adopted person under the age of 21, or the adoptive parent of a deceased adopted or surrendered person, and the confidential intermediary may request any non-identifying information.
Title
ADOPTION-NONIDENTIFYING INFO
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0252 |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2023-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 014-000-000 |
2023-04-18 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2023-03-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Judiciary |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
750 | 50 | 18.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |