IL SB2132 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Pupils Article of the School Code. In provisions regarding compulsory school age, provides that a student absent from a school in which the student is regularly enrolled shall be considered as being in attendance if the reason for such absence is to participate in scheduled Future Farmers of America Organization and 4-H programs as part of organized competitions or exhibitions. Provides that the student and parent or legal guardian shall be responsible for obtaining assignments missed while the student was participating in such an activity from the student's teacher.
Title
SCH CD-FFH/4H ABSENCES
Sponsors
Sen. Doris Turner [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] |
Sen. Sally Turner [R] | Sen. Erica Harriss [R] | Sen. Celina Villanueva [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2023 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 26-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2132&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2132.htm |