IL SB2132 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates a credit for each child of the taxpayer who is under the age of 17 in an amount equal to $100. Provides that the credit shall be reduced by $5 for each $2,000 by which the taxpayer's net income exceeds $60,000 in the case of a joint return or exceeds $40,000 in the case of any other form of return. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-CHILD TAX CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Re-assigned to Revenue |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |