IL SB2132 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Clean Energy Jobs Act. Contains only a short title provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CLEAN ENERGY JOBS-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-05-09SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-05-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-04-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-03-21SenatePostponed - Energy and Public Utilities
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-03-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-03-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2019-03-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
2019-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Energy and Public Utilities
2019-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback