IL SB2130 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pesticide Act. Increases the first offense penalty for applying pesticides without a license, misrepresenting certification, failing to comply with conditions of an agrichemical facility permit, failing to comply with the conditions of a written authorization for land application of agrichemical contaminated soils or groundwater, or for constructing or operating without an agrichemical facility permit after receiving written notification from $500 to $750. Increases the subsequent offense penalty for these violations from $1,000 to $1,500. Makes various changes to the violation point structure used for assessing administrative penalties for violations of the Act and rules, including increasing the monetary penalties by specified amounts and adding a $500 penalty for a 12 to 13 point violation.
Title
PESTICIDE ACT-PENALTIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 60 | 24.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2130&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2130.htm |