IL SB2129 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Animal Welfare Act. Provides that if a person or entity fails or refuses to pay an administrative fine imposed by the Department of Agriculture for a violation of the Act, the Department may prohibit that person or entity from renewing a license under the Act until the fine is paid in full. Provides that any penalty of $500 or more not paid within 120 days of issuance by the Department shall be submitted to the Department of Revenue for collection as provided under the Illinois State Collection Act of 1986. Effective immediately.
Title
ANIMAL WELFARE-FINE COLLECTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 605 | 20.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2129&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2129.htm |