IL SB2123 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission shall implement a project to be called the Renewable Energy Pay As You Save Program. Provides for the purpose and requirements of the Program. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission shall convene a workshop process during which interested participants may discuss issues related to the Program. Provides that each applicable electric utility shall submit an informational filing to the Commission that describes its plan for implementing provisions regarding the Program. Provides that electric utilities shall work with lenders selected pursuant to a request for proposals process and with vendors to establish the terms and processes under which a participant can purchase eligible renewable energy generation and energy storage systems using the financing obtained from a lender through a financing program designed to fit the Pay As You Save model. Provides further requirements concerning the establishment of financing programs based upon the Pay As You Save model. Provides that the Commission shall adopt all rules necessary for administration. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ENERGY-PAY AS YOU SAVE PROGRAM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
2019-04-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 3, 2019
2019-03-28SenateDo Pass as Amended Energy and Public Utilities; 017-000-000
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-03-21SenatePostponed - Energy and Public Utilities
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Energy and Public Utilities
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2038551-59New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback