IL SB2123 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0356
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0356
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section creating the civil administrative agencies.
Title
WORKFORCE INVESTMENT BD-INFO
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-12 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0356 |
2011-08-12 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-08-12 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-14 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000 |
2011-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor Committee; 019-000-000 |
2011-05-04 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2011-04-25 | House | Assigned to Labor Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Biss |
2011-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 31, 2011 |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Commerce; 007-000-000 |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 8, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 5 | 5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |