IL SB2122 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides for legislative findings. Provides that, subject to appropriation, the Illinois Community College Board shall establish a community college apprenticeship grant program to expand opportunities for credit and non-credit education and training leading to high-demand jobs through apprenticeship programs offered in partnership with a community college and a local business or industry. Provides that the grants must be prioritized to expand apprenticeship programs to new populations, develop apprenticeships in new, non-traditional sectors, and identify ways to promote greater inclusion and diversity in apprenticeships. Requires the Illinois Community College Board to adopt rules. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMM COLL-APPRENTICE PROGRAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019
2019-05-20HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-05-16HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2019-05-16HousePension Note Filed
2019-05-15HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2019-05-15HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-15HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2019-05-15HouseState Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-05-15HousePension Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-05-15HouseBalanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-05-15HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-24HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-04-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-04HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-04HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-04-04HouseArrived in House
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-04-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-03-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-03-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019
2019-03-12SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 012-000-000
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1108052-26New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback