IL SB2120 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0369
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Capital Development Board Act. Removes specific references to the Illinois Building Authority and school districts in the definition of State agency. Removes specific references to research on solar energy systems. Provides that members of the Capital Development Board may give bond by inclusion in the blanket bond or bonds or the self-insurance program provided for in the Official Bond Act. Provides that the time for Capital Development Board meetings shall be as prescribed by Capital Development Board rules. Provides that purchases under the Act are subject to the Illinois Procurement Code. Effective January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CDB-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0369
2019-08-09SenateEffective Date December 15, 2019
2019-08-09SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 006-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-05-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 29, 2019
2019-05-28SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2019-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2019-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-05-28HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2019-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
2019-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-04-24HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-09HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-04-04HouseArrived in House
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateDo Pass State Government; 005-000-000
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20310510.02Amended CodeCitation Text
20310510.02aRepealed CodeCitation Text
20310510.02bRepealed CodeCitation Text
20310510.03Amended CodeCitation Text
20310510.05Amended CodeCitation Text
20310510.09-1Amended CodeCitation Text
20310512Amended CodeCitation Text
20310518Repealed CodeCitation Text
2031053Amended CodeCitation Text
2031054.03Amended CodeCitation Text
2031054.04Amended CodeCitation Text
2031056Amended CodeCitation Text
2031057Amended CodeCitation Text
2031059.01aRepealed CodeCitation Text
2031059.01bRepealed CodeCitation Text
2031059.01cRepealed CodeCitation Text
2031059.02Amended CodeCitation Text
2031059.07Amended CodeCitation Text
2031059.09Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2120&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2120.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2120eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2120enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0369.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2120ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2120ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB2120_04042019_015000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB2120_05282019_013000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB2120ham002_05302019_049000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback