IL SB2101 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firefighters' Pension Investment Fund Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a trustee shall qualify by taking an oath of office before the Secretary of State or the Board's appointed legal counsel (instead of only the Secretary of State). In a provision concerning reimbursement for travel expenses for trustees, removes a reference to the standards in effect for members of the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability. In a provision concerning voting for trustees by participants and beneficiaries, removes language requiring the ballot envelope to have a certificate stating that the person voting the ballot is entitled to vote. Provides that a trustee appointed to fill the vacancy of an elected trustee shall serve until a successor is elected. Removes language providing that for a vacancy of an elected trustee occurring with an unexpired term of 6 months or more, an election shall be conducted for the vacancy. Makes a conforming change. Provides that special elections to fill the remainder of an unexpired term vacated by an elected trustee shall be held concurrently with and in the same manner as the next regular election for an elected trustee position. Provides that a copy of the rules adopted by the Fund shall be posted on the Fund's website (instead of filed with the Secretary of State and the Department of Insurance). Makes changes concerning indemnification of the Fund, the board, and the officers and employees of the Fund. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PENCD-FIRE PENSION INVEST FUND

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2023-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023
2023-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2023-03-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2023
2023-03-10SenateDo Pass Senate Special Committee on Pensions; 010-000-000
2023-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate Special Committee on Pensions
2023-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2023-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40522C-115Amended CodeCitation Text
40522C-116Amended CodeCitation Text
40522C-119Amended CodeCitation Text
40522C-123Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback