IL SB2099 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0630
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Coronavirus Urgent Remediation Emergency (CURE) Borrowing Act. Provides that the Governor, with the approval of the Comptroller and Treasurer, is authorized to borrow funds from the Federal Reserve Bank or its agent in accordance with the Municipal Liquidity Facility program established under the federal Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Stabilization Act (CARES) Act and the Federal Reserve Act, or in accordance with federal coronavirus financing legislation. Sets forth the purposes for which such funds can be used. Provides for the terms for borrowing, provides that the total amount borrowed may not exceed $5,000,000,000 outstanding at any time, and provides for the repayment of funds borrowed. Provides a continuing appropriation for the repayment of funds borrowed. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Coronavirus Urgent Remediation Emergency Borrowing Fund and makes conforming changes. Amends the Short Term Borrowing Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CURE BORROWING ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-22 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-29SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0630
2020-05-29SenateGovernor Approved
2020-05-29SenateSent to the Governor
2020-05-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2020-05-22SenatePassed Both Houses
2020-05-22SenateSenate Concurs
2020-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 037-019-000
2020-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 3/5 Vote Required
2020-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 037-019-000
2020-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 3/5 Vote Required
2020-05-22SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 037-019-000
2020-05-22SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 3/5 Vote Required
2020-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 - May 22, 2020
2020-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2020-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2020-05-22SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2020-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2020-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
2020-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2020-05-22SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
2020-05-22SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2020-05-22SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
2020-05-22SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3
2020-05-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-045-000
2020-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2020-05-22HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2020-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2020-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-005-000
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2020-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2020-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2020-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2020-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2020-05-21HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000
2020-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2020-05-21HouseLegislation Considered in Special Session No. 1
2020-05-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
2020-05-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-05-20HouseSuspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote
2020-05-20HouseMoved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris
2020-05-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2020-05-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2020-05-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris; ; was filed before 3 pm
2020-05-18HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2020-01-20SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2019-11-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-03-27HouseArrived in House
2019-03-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateDo Pass State Government; 005-000-000
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305001-10Amended CodeCitation Text
305255.1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2099&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2099.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2099eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2099enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0630.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2099ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2099ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2099ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB2099_03272019_023000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB2099_05222020_006000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB2099ham003_05222020_005002C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB2099ham002_05222020_005001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB2099ham001_05222020_005000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback