IL SB2093 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0636
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0636
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes: Changes the dates of the conditional grace period for contract schools to show evidence of timely and good faith efforts to submit payroll records and make pension contributions due to between January 1, 2022 and April 1, 2022 (rather than between July 1, 2021 and October 1, 2021). Provides that participation in the Fund shall begin on January 1, 2022 for educational staff of a contract school beginning employment on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Allows educational staff employed in a contract school before the effective date of the amendatory Act that elect to participate in the Fund to participate as a member for service accrued after January 1, 2022 (rather than after the effective date of the election) with the contract school, another contract school, a charter school, or the Board of Education. Prohibits a person from accruing service for employment with a contract school that occurred before January 1, 2022 (rather than before the effective date of the election to participate as a member).
Title
PEN CD-CTPF-CONTRACT SCHOOLS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0636 |
2021-08-27 | Senate | Effective Date August 27, 2021 |
2021-08-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Pensions |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2021-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2021-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-05-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2021-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 007-001-000 |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 034-018-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Pensions; 006-003-000 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Pensions |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 17-105.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-132 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-134.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |