IL SB2092 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Revenue Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Revenue shall establish and administer a State Property Tax Relief Reimbursement Pilot Program for the purpose of reimbursing taxing districts for property tax revenue loss associated with State facilities. Sets forth the amount of the reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-REIMBURSEMENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2092&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2092.htm |